CT SB00880 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Office of Policy and Management to study responsible development.
Title
An Act Concerning Responsible Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2015-03-25 | Senate | File Number 210 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 174 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |