CT SB00880 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Increasing Fairness And Transparency In The Criminal Justice System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 311 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Public Act 19-59 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 677 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9747 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 836 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 437 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |