CT SB00882 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Municipal Employees' Retirement System And Authorizing Bonding For The City Of Bridgeport's Pension Plan A Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 381 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B, C (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B, C (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-124 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B,C |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 734 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B,C |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 11064 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10659 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 11064 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 724 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 350 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |