CT SB00886 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To rename Albert J. Solnit Children's Center to Albert J. Solnit Children's Hospital, and require such hospital to obtain licensure from the Department of Public Health.
Title
An Act Concerning The Licensure Of The Albert J. Solnit Children's Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Special Act 19-16 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 662 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 135 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 85 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |