CT SB00894 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 649
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 649
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To identify nonlethal management practices that can be employed to deter black bears from habituating in areas densely populated by humans.
Title
An Act Concerning The Nonlethal Management Of The Black Bear Population In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 PASS (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 649 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | File Number 566 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 278 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |