CT SB00898 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To redirect state funds previously distributed by the Department of Social Services to a new fund managed by a nonprofit organization that will disburse grants in a competitive procurement process to community organizations that serve Hispanic persons and communities of color.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Hispanic And Fellow Communities Of Color Nonprofit Stabilization And Growth Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-21SenateFile Number 107
2019-03-21SenateSenate Calendar Number 74
2019-03-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-21SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-07SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-07SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback