CT SB00906 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) permit the Insurance Commissioner to obtain the services of certain third-party professionals, (2) eliminate an opt-out concerning disability income insurance products in the Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact, (3) modify a voting requirement concerning reorganizing insurers, (4) change the effective date of, and repeal, certain sections of Public Act 18-158, (5) provide that certain notices concerning licensees and commercial risk insurance policies may be made by electronic means, and (6) eliminate certain requirements concerning the insolvency of health care centers.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Department's Recommended Changes To The Insurance Statutes, Insurance Plans Procured By The Comptroller And Retirement Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 365 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-125 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 729 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10924 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 266 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 169 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |