CT SB00907 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 579
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 579
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a seller to disclose to a purchaser in the "Residential Condition Report" any facts that are within the seller's actual knowledge concerning (1) the presence of pyrrhotite in the concrete foundations located on the seller's property, (2) any testing or inspection done by a licensed professional to determine whether such foundations contain pyrrhotite, (3) any foundation deterioration, problems or settling caused by the presence of pyrrhotite in such foundations, and (4) any repairs to remedy such deterioration, problems or settling.
Title
An Act Concerning The Residential Disclosure Report And Crumbling Concrete Foundations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 579 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8472 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 372 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 195 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |