CT SB00911 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 838
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 838
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify state law with respect to reopening a judgment of strict foreclosure when a bankruptcy petition has been filed.
Title
An Act Concerning The Opening Of A Judgment Of Strict Foreclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 838 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 439 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |