CT SB00919 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To remove the term "homemaker" in reference to home health aide agencies and services.
Title
An Act Removing The Term "homemaker" In Reference To Home Health Aide Agencies And Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 388 (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 19-97 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 508 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 231 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 129 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |