CT SB00920 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding various revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations For Various Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Fred Camillo [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] |
Rep. William Petit [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 363 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 347 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 347 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-118 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 726 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10597 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 10959 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | File Number 762 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 372 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |