CT SB00922 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To allow students to self-apply over-the-counter sunscreen products while in school prior to engaging in outdoor activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing Students To Apply Sunscreen Prior To Engaging In Outdoor Activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 310 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 49 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-60
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 470
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6829
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 232
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 130
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback