CT SB00923 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow behavior analysts to participate in the professional assistance program for regulated professionals.
Title
An Act Allowing Behavior Analysts To Participate In The Professional Assistance Program For Regulated Professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 580 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 233 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 131 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |