CT SB00924 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement recommendations by the Department of Motor Vehicles regarding motor vehicle registration notice, the International Registration Plan, carriers, the Medical Advisory Board and other motor vehicle statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Motor Vehicle Registration Notice, The International Registration Plan, Carriers, School Buses, The Medical Advisory Board, Reserved Parking Spaces, Autonomous Vehicles And Other Motor Vehicle Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 334 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 297 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10630 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 9466 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 299 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 297 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 10630 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 9466 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 299 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-119 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-03 | House | House Calendar Number 718 |
2019-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9466 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10630 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10174 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 526 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 269 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |