CT SB00927 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create an environmental infrastructure fund within the Connecticut Green Bank.
Title
An Act Creating The Environmental Infrastructure Fund Within The Connecticut Green Bank.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Sen. James Maroney [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Rep. Terrie Wood [R] | Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Rep. Jason Doucette [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 157 PASS SENATE AMD B LCO 8814 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 PASS SENATE AMD C LCO 8423 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 159 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,D (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 PASS SENATE AMD C LCO 8423 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 159 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,D (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Calendar Number 612 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,D |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 8827 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8423 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8814 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8486 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-04-01 | Senate | File Number 260 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 141 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |