CT SB00945 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide a financial incentive for nonprofit providers to provide cost-efficient and innovative state-funded human services by allowing them to keep a percentage of savings from the contracted cost and reinvest the savings in services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Innovation Incentive Program For Nonprofit Providers Of Human Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 347 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 343 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-127
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseRules Suspended
2019-06-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 727
2019-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8233
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 528
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 245
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback