CT SB00949 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for the Harry Ruffin, Jr. American Legion Post 206.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For The Harry Ruffin, Jr. American Legion Post 206.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |