CT SB00950 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a veterans' cemetery account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Veterans' Cemetery Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateFile Number 166
2019-03-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 103
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback