CT SB00951 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require fifteen per cent of available seats in certain alternate route to certification programs to be reserved for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Veteran Enrollment In Certain Alternate Route To Certification Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 110 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-62
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 550
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-08SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7891
2019-04-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24SenateNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Education
2019-03-26SenateFile Number 167
2019-03-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 104
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback