CT SB00956 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - File Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - File Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections and to require the Department of Public Health to develop programs and promote research on pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections.
Title
An Act Concerning Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorder Associated With Streptococcal Infections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | File Number 72 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 124 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |