CT SB00956 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the State Board of Education to adopt guidelines for a comprehensive school counselor program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Guidelines For A Comprehensive School Counselor Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 308 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-63
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 472
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7133
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 326
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 152
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback