CT SB00977 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - House Calendar Number 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - House Calendar Number 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require health carriers that deliver, issue for delivery, renew, amend or continue certain health insurance policies in this state to issue explanations of benefits to consumers in certain circumstances, disclose information concerning explanations of benefits to consumers, and require that explanations of benefits be maintained as confidential in certain circumstances.
Title
An Act Concerning Explanations Of Benefits.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] | Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 67 PASS SENATE AMD A LCO 7188 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 68 PASS SENATE AMD B LCO 7462 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 69 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 8 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 68 PASS SENATE AMD B LCO 7462 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 69 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 8 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 509 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7188 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7462 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7188 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 376 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 198 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |