CT SB00992 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To foster trust between residents and city and state officials and ensure public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Trust Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 252 SENATE AMD A (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED (Y: 79 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 7494 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 7503 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 ADOPT SENATE AMD G LCO 7518 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 7502 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 8668 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 ADOPT SENATE AMD J LCO 8330 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 ADOPT SENATE AMD K LCO 8756 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A & K (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 138 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8439 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 139 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8630 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 140 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8628 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-20
2019-05-30SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-30SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,K
2019-05-30SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule K
2019-05-30SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16SenateHouse Calendar Number 608
2019-05-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,K
2019-05-14SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule K 8756
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule J 8330
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 8668
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 7502
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 7518
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 7503
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 7494
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8628
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8630
2019-05-14SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8439
2019-05-14SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7531
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 535
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 244
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-04SenatePublic Hearing 03/08
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00992&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00992-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00992-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00020-R00SB-00992-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00992-R00JUD-CV64-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00148-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00147-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00146-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00145-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00144-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00143-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00142-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00141-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00140-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00139-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00138-R00SB00992-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00253-R00SB00992-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00252-R00SB00992-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback