CT SB00994 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow a municipality to pay a disabled police officer the difference between the amount the officer would have received as pay if he or she could continue performing duties as an officer and the amount he or she is receiving from various benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing Municipalities To Cover The Pay Gap For Disabled Police Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 536
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 261
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback