CT SB00996 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for more appropriate enforcement of statute concerning unlawful employment of state officers or employees to influence legislation, to make a technical correction, to clarify provisions regarding the recording of telephone conversations at the behest of law enforcement, to provide an enhanced penalty in the case of second degree assault with a firearm, to extend protections against lockout to additional tenants and lessees, to repeal obsolete provisions concerning the state's attorney's role in the removal of town clerks and town treasurers and to repeal obsolete provisions regarding the role of the state's attorney with regard to highway construction and neglect of a highway.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Various Statutes Concerning The Criminal Justice System And Revising Provisions Concerning Jailhouse Witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 340 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 10697 (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 341 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 340 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 10697 (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 341 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-132 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 730 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10697 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 841 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 442 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |