CT SB01002 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 569
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide incentive for the use of technology by operators of anaerobic digesters that enables the conversion of phosphate rich bywastes into a useful commercial product.
Title
An Act Concerning Phosphate Bywastes From Anaerobic Digesters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | File Number 569 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 281 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |