CT SB01015 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) authorize the Connecticut Lottery Corporation to offer online lottery draw games, (2) exempt certain records concerning the corporation's voluntary self-exclusion process from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act, and (3) increase the corporation's contribution to the chronic gamblers treatment rehabilitation account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Online Lottery Draw Games In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 540
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 263
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback