CT SB01016 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To make technical corrections in the emergency preparedness statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Emergency Preparedness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 541
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 264
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback