CT SB01020 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To include instruction in culturally responsive pedagogy and practice in the preservice training, professional development and in-service training provided to teachers.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Instruction In Culturally Responsive Pedagogy And Practice In The Preservice Training, Professional Development And In-service Training Provided To Teachers.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Rep. Henry Genga [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 19-100 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 545 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 380 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 185 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |