CT SB01022 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-8-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To recruit and retain minority teachers in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Minority Teacher Recruitment And Retention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 298 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 235 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-18SenatePublic Act 19-74
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 680
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9866
2019-05-28SenateAmendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 9071
2019-05-16SenateFile Number 899
2019-05-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 493
2019-05-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback