CT SB01026 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) eliminate the capital base tax for companies with less than five hundred thousand dollars of net income in an income year; (2) eliminate the cap on the aggregate amount of tax credits and excess tax credits allowable to businesses subject to the corporation business tax; (3) require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to implement the development, research and economic assistance matching grant program; (4) require Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated to contract with an advertising agency to develop a marketing plan, social media campaign, and Internet web site to promote the state as a bioscience hub; and (5) establish the position of biotechnology ambassador within the Department of Economic and Community Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Marketing Plan To Promote The Bioscience Industry In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 260 AS AMENDED (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-21
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-17SenateHouse Calendar Number 618
2019-05-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-16SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8892
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 382
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 182
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback