CT SB01029 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the director of each technical education and career school to meet with representatives of public utilities and representatives of certain state colleges and universities to assess workforce needs and implement curriculum modifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Workforce Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-150
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateHouse Calendar Number 688
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-29SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-29SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-29SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9758
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 383
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 183
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback