CT SB01034 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for brownfield remediation and development projects.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Brownfield Remediation And Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |