CT SB01039 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make the names of dependent children residing with the filer of a statement of financial interest confidential.
Title
An Act Concerning The Confidentiality Of Statements Of Financial Interest.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Christie Carpino [R] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 38 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 54 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 54 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Act 19-2 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-04-23 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Calendar Number 475 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 458 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |