CT SB01048 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To transfer responsibility for maintaining the online databases concerning state expenditures from the Office of Fiscal Analysis to the office of the Comptroller and to require quasi-public agencies to submit data for posting on said databases.
Title
An Act Concerning The Online Database For State Expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 120 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 19-102 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 570 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 547 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 238 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |