CT SB01051 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To improve home care services by requiring certain training levels, background checks and a directory of home care workers.
Title
An Act Strengthening Home Care Services.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 548 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 246 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |