CT SB01052 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Social Services to expand Medicaid coverage of telehealth services state wide whenever such coverage meets federal Medicaid requirements for efficiency, economy and quality of care.
Title
An Act Expanding Medicaid Coverage Of Telehealth Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 300 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public Act 19-76 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 548 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7555 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 549 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 247 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |