CT SB01055 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Establish a task force to study the juror selection process, (2) provide access to certain records, information and media recordings in the possession of the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services, Connecticut Valley Hospital or the Psychiatric Security Review Board, (3) modify sentence enhancements for persistent larceny offenders, and (4) modify nonfinancial conditions of release that a court may impose in the case of a bailable offense.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Juror Selection Process, Providing Access To Certain Records Possessed By The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services, Connecticut Valley Hospital And The Psychiatric Security Review Board, And Concerning Sentencing Of Persistent Larceny Offenders And Confidentiality Upon Application To A Diversionary Program.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Toni Walker [D] | Sen. Norman Needleman [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] |
Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Derek Slap [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 369 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 342 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 342 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-151 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 732 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8822 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 842 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 443 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |