CT SB01057 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 731
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To combat opioid use disorder in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Opioid Use Disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 731
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 360
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback