CT SB01058 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - House Calendar Number 516
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require tattoo technicians to comply with the infection prevention and control plan guidelines prescribed by the Commissioner of Public Health and to require student tattoo technicians to complete minimum educational requirements under a supervising licensed tattoo technician.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Licensure Of Tattoo Technicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 516
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7383
2019-04-18SenateFile Number 764
2019-04-18SenateSenate Calendar Number 373
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-18SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback