CT SB01061 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To restore recent funds cut from the community investment account.
Title
An Act Concerning The Restoration Of Funds To The Community Investment Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | File Number 660 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 319 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |