CT SB01063 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to develop recommendations for improving the availability of farmland for first-time farmers.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Improve Farmland Availability For Beginning Farmers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 106 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 546 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | File Number 640 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 307 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |