CT SB01069 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various revisions and additions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions And Additions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 322 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-19 | House | Public Act 19-91 |
2019-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-04 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-04 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-04 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10841 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 665 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9170 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | File Number 642 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 303 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |