CT SB01070 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for court-appointed conservators to bring residential, commercial and industrial buildings into municipal code compliance when owners fail to comply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Abandoned And Blighted Property Receivership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 318 PASS (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19HousePublic Act 19-92
2019-06-04HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseRules Suspended
2019-06-04HouseDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10830
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateHouse Calendar Number 682
2019-05-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-28SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9593
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 732
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 353
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback