CT SB01078 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - House Calendar Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - House Calendar Number 619
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide state certification of doulas, Medicaid reimbursement for their services and study the effects of doula services on health outcomes for pregnant Medicaid beneficiaries and their infants.
Title
An Act Concerning Doula Certification And Medicaid Reimbursement For Doula Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Calendar Number 619 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8777 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | File Number 603 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 288 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |