CT SB01080 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To promote family economic success across generations through the establishment of a cabinet designed to help coordinate services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Two-generational Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 301 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 113 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-18SenatePublic Act 19-78
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 571
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7575
2019-05-09SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7749
2019-05-09SenateSenate Reconsidered
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7749
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 604
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 289
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-15SenatePublic Hearing 03/21
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback