CT SB01085 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 843
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 843
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To legalize and regulate the recreational use of cannabis and to allow for erasure of criminal records for convictions based on the possession of small amounts of cannabis.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legalization Of The Retail Sale And Possession Of Cannabis And Concerning Erasure Of Criminal Records In The Case Of Convictions Based On The Possession Of A Small Amount Of Cannabis.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 843 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 444 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |