CT SB01088 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure the health and well-being of a nursing home resident who is at risk of being involuntarily transferred from one facility to another as the result of a receivership proceeding.
Title
An Act Concerning Participation By A Resident Of A Nursing Home Facility Or Residential Care Home In A Receivership Proceeding.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Stephanie Cummings [R] |
Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 19-42 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 551 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | File Number 803 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 395 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |