CT SB01089 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 804
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 804
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that no employer is required to make accommodations for or allow employees to use or possess cannabis in the workplace.
Title
An Act Concerning Cannabis And The Workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | File Number 804 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 396 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |