CT SB01091 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To designate various days and weeks in order to honor or recognize certain groups or raise awareness regarding certain diseases and to create a Centennial Commission on Women's Suffrage account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Designating Various Days And Weeks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-152
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24SenateHouse Calendar Number 667
2019-05-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-23SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-23SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9598
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 737
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 338
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback